+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On June 9, 2016 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H4367
On October 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing rescheduled to 10/27/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
On October 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 10/27/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Public Service