+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On June 20, 2018 in the House:
- Accompanied a new draft, see H4640
On June 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On June 19, 2018 in the House:
- Discharged to the committee on House Ways and Means
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Monday July 2, 2018, pending concurrence
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 9, 2018, pending concurrence
On September 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 09/19/2017 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Labor and Workforce Development
+ − Sponsors (79)
Type:
Primary Sponsor