+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On December 1, 2020 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H5160
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Discharged to the committee on Financial Services
On June 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Public Service
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor