+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 6 of the Acts of 2013
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Enacted
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Emergency preamble adopted
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Emergency preamble adopted
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second, rules suspended, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
- Rules suspended
- Committee recommended ought to pass
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
- Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Public Service
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor