+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On October 13, 2022 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H5201
On January 13, 2022 in the House:
- Reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Health Care Financing
On October 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 10/28/2021 from 09:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Public Health