+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On May 2, 2022 in the House:
- Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- Reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Health Care Financing
On November 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 11/15/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities