+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On May 23, 2016 in the House:
- Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
On November 30, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Health Care Financing
On November 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 11/17/2015 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Public Service
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor