+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On November 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 112 of the Acts of 2017
On November 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On November 6, 2017 in the House:
- Enacted
On November 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On October 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
On October 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On September 27, 2017 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On September 25, 2017 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On September 21, 2017 in the House:
- Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On July 5, 2017 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
On June 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Housing