+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On July 29, 2022 in the House:
- Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H5137
- Read third
- Rules suspended
On December 16, 2021 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On December 13, 2021 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On September 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 09/28/2021 from 12:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Municipalities and Regional Government
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor