+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On October 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 65 of the Acts of 2021
On October 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On October 14, 2021 in the House:
- Enacted
On October 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
- Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
On August 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
On July 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On July 28, 2021 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On June 3, 2021 in the House:
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
- Rules suspended
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 05/17/2021 from 12:00 PM-12:01 PM in Written Testimony Only
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Municipalities and Regional Government
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor