+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/18/2015 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2
- Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/10/2015 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security