+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 1, 2019 in the House:
- No further action taken
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Discharged to the committee on House Rules
On November 22, 2017 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
On September 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 09/19/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor