+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On July 2, 2018 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H4638
On June 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On June 12, 2017 in the House:
- Discharged to the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor