+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On September 8, 2014 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H4447
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday May 15, 2014, pending concurrence
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 04/04/2013 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor