+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On November 10, 2020 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H5117
On August 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing rescheduled to 08/28/2019 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2
On August 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 08/28/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor