+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 01/19/2016 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
On June 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor