+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On June 30, 2014 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H4234
On October 10, 2013 in the House:
On July 3, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2013 from 09:30 AM-05:00 PM in B-2
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Public Health
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor