+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On November 10, 2020 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H5117
On December 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 01/24/2020 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
On November 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD
On November 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 12/02/2019 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor