+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 18, 2016 in the House:
- Accompanied a new draft, see H4307
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday June 30, 2016, pending concurrence
On June 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/23/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Public Health
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor