+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On October 6, 2016 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H4686
On July 7, 2016 in the House:
- Reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Health Care Financing
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday June 30, 2016, pending concurrence
On September 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing rescheduled to 09/29/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
On September 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 09/29/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Public Health
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor