+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On September 26, 2016 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H4635
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Health Care Financing
On October 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Public Health
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor