+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On October 15, 2020 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H5038
On April 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 2, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Saturday May 30, 2020, pending concurrence
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday April 1, 2020, pending concurrence
On November 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 11/19/2019 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Public Health
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor