+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On June 22, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
On April 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 29, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence
On March 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 23, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Health Care Financing
On October 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing rescheduled to 10/08/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
On September 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 10/08/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Public Health
+ − Sponsors (47)
Type:
Primary Sponsor