+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On November 22, 2019 in the House:
- Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
On September 18, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Health Care Financing
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Public Health
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor