+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On November 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 12/07/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on The Judiciary