+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On September 26, 2016 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H4635
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Health Care Financing
On July 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Mental Health and Substance Abuse
+ − Sponsors (65)
Type:
Primary Sponsor