+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On August 15, 2016 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H4578
On October 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing rescheduled to 10/27/2015 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in 437
On October 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 10/27/2015 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor