+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On January 1, 2019 in the House:
- No further action taken
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
On October 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 10/31/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Tourism, Arts and Cultural Development