+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Accompanied S864
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- House concurred
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Amendment (changing reporting date to Thursday May 01, 2014) adopted, pending concurrence
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday July 31, 2014, pending concurrence
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 05/28/2013 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-1
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Labor and Workforce Development