+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On July 30, 2020 in the House:
- Reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Health Care Financing
On July 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On July 16, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 29, 2020, pending concurrence
On July 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On May 14, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 15, 2020, pending concurrence
On April 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 15, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday May 15, 2020, pending concurrence
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday April 15, 2020, pending concurrence
On July 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2019 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-1
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery
+ − Sponsors (48)
Type:
Primary Sponsor