+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 1, 2019 in the House:
- No further action taken
On May 14, 2018 in the House:
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 01/30/2018 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight