+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On September 22, 2016 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H4624
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Monday May 2, 2016, pending concurrence
On July 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing rescheduled to 07/14/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
On July 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 07/14/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on The Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor