+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On October 27, 2022 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H5173
On June 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 19, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday June 30, 2022, pending concurrence
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday April 15, 2022, pending concurrence
On November 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 12/07/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on The Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor