+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H4244
On October 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD
On October 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 10/31/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
On September 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 10/31/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Revenue