+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On June 26, 2014 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H4218
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Monday June 30, 2014, pending concurrence
On July 9, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2013 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on The Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor