+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On August 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Discharged to the committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on The Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor