+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On October 24, 2016 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H4706
On July 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing rescheduled to 07/14/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
On July 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 07/14/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on The Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor