+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On June 6, 2016 in the House:
- Accompanied a new draft, see H4369
On May 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On May 2, 2016 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday June 1, 2016, pending concurrence
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Monday May 2, 2016, pending concurrence
On September 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 09/16/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on The Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor