+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 1, 2019 in the House:
- No further action taken
On December 21, 2017 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On December 7, 2017 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing rescheduled to 06/27/2017 from 11:00 AM-03:30 PM in A1
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/27/2017 from 11:00 AM-03:30 PM in 437
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Public Service
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor