+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On July 7, 2022 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
On May 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On May 12, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday June 30, 2022, pending concurrence
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Monday May 9, 2022, pending concurrence
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Tuesday March 8, 2022, pending concurrence
On September 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 10/12/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Housing
+ − Sponsors (41)
Type:
Primary Sponsor