+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On October 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 94 of the Acts of 2017
On October 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On October 4, 2017 in the House:
- Enacted
On October 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On September 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
On September 5, 2017 in the House:
- Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 03/28/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B1
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Public Service
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor