+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 25, 2022 in the House:
- Accompanied a new draft, see H4694
On March 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Monday April 4, 2022, pending concurrence
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/08/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Higher Education