+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On July 7, 2014 in the House:
- Accompanied a new draft, see H4243
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 04/09/2014 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Monday June 30, 2014, pending concurrence
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on The Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor