+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- New draft substituted, see H4021
- Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending
- Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending
- Committee recommends ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H4021
On October 1, 2015 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
On July 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 07/14/2015 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
- Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD
On July 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 07/14/2015 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities
+ − Amendment
Amendment #1
An Act renaming certain facilities,
departments, and references in law and regulation
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor