+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On October 24, 2016 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H4706
On November 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 11/18/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
On September 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 09/28/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Western New England School of Law
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on The Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor