+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 2, 2020 in the House:
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing rescheduled to 04/30/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in B-2
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 04/30/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in 437
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Housing
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor