+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On April 2, 2020 in the House:
- Discharged to the committee on House Rules
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Higher Education