+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2013 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Housing
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor