+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 1, 2019 in the House:
- No further action taken
On May 23, 2018 in the House:
- Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
- Accompanied by S1167
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 16, 2018, pending concurrence
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- House concurred
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday April 25, 2018, pending concurrence
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Health Care Financing
On December 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 12/19/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Public Health
+ − Sponsors (92)
Type:
Primary Sponsor