+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On July 2, 2018 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H4681
On May 14, 2018 in the House:
- Reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Health Care Financing
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Amendment (changing reporting date to Wednesday May 9, 2018) adopted, pending concurrence
- Reporting date extended to Saturday June 30, 2018, pending concurrence
On November 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Public Health
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor